Gai, Tina Dinyar (CPSO#: 78694)

Current Status: Active Member as of 24 Mar 2008

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 24 Mar 2008

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Gujarati, Hindi, Marathi

Education:University of Bombay, 1985

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
West Lincoln Memorial Hospital
Dept of Obstetrics and Gynaecology
169 Main Street East
Grimsby ON  L3M 1P3
Phone: (905) 309-8723
Fax: (905) 309-8724
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Tina Gai Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 14 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. T. Gai ( CPSO# 78694 )

Business Address:
West Lincoln Memorial Hospital
Department of Obstetrics & Gynaecology
169 Main Street East
Grimsby ON  L3M 1P3
Phone Number: (905) 309-8723

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
West Lincoln Memorial Hospital Grimsby

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Obstetrics and Gynecology Effective: 01 Jan 2007 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. TINA DINYAR GAI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GAI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Dec 2002 to 01 Jun 2003
International Specialist Physician - Obstetrics and Gynecology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Dec 2002
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 01 Jun 2003
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 04 Jul 2003
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 03 Jul 2008
Terms and conditions amended by Effective: 03 Jul 2008
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Mar 2008