Gaik, Pamela Leigh (CPSO#: 60760)

Current Status: Active Member as of 19 Jul 1990

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 19 Jul 1990

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1989

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Marotta Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 18 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Marotta ( CPSO# 59483 )
Dr. P. Gaik ( CPSO# 60760 )

Business Address:
Oakville Trafalgar Memorial Hospital
3001 Hospital Gate
Oakville ON  L6M 0L8
Phone Number: (905) 338-4601

Business Address:
Milton District Hospital
30 Derry Road East
Milton ON  L9T 2X5
Phone Number: (905) 878-2383

Business Address:
Georgetown Hospital
1 Princess Anne Drive
Georgetown ON  L7G 2B8
Phone Number: (905) 873-0111

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. PAMELA LEIGH GAIK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GAIK is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Other - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1989
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1990
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Jul 1990