Gainey, Richard Joseph (CPSO#: 30790)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 17 Jul 2001

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 17 Jul 2001

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:National University of Ireland, 1971

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 17 Nov 1981 RCPSC Specialist
Rheumatology Effective: 06 Dec 1983 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Jun 1979
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 11 Jul 1984
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Apr 1985
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 17 Jul 2001