Gajardo, Paz Alejandra (CPSO#: 84495)

Current Status: Active Member as of 12 Feb 2009

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 12 Feb 2009

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Spanish

Education:McMaster University, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Davenport Perth Community
Health Centre
1892 Davenport Road
Toronto ON  M6N 1B7
Phone: (416) 658-6812
Fax: (416) 658-4611
Electoral District: 10
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Christie Refugee Health Clinic
43 Christie Street
Toronto ON  M6G 3B1
Canada
Phone: (416) 588-9277
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
St Michael's Hospital Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 10 Dec 2008 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. PAZ ALEJANDRA GAJARDO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GAJARDO is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2006
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2008
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 06 Aug 2008
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 05 Aug 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 12 Feb 2009