Gajdowski, Richard Jan (CPSO#: 54511)

Current Status: Active Member as of 17 Jun 2003

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 17 Jun 2003

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French, Polish

Education:University of Ottawa, 1984

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Windsor Regional Hospital
1995 Lens Avenue
Windsor ON  N8W 1L9
Phone: (519) 997-3333
Electoral District: 01
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: R J Gajdowski Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 31 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. H. Liang ( CPSO# 29131 )
Dr. R. Gajdowski ( CPSO# 54511 )

Business Address:
Windsor Regional Hospital
1995 Lens Avenue
Windsor ON  N8W 1L9
Phone Number: (519) 997-3333

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Quebec
USA - Florida
USA - Michigan
USA - New Jersey
USA - New York
USA - Ohio
USA - Pennsylvania

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Windsor Regional Hospital,Metropolitan Site Windsor

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Emergency Medicine Effective: 13 Nov 1990 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. RICHARD JAN GAJDOWSKI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GAJDOWSKI is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1984 to 30 Jun 1985
Other - Rotating Internship

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1984
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 02 Jul 1985
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 25 Jun 1993
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Jun 2003