Gajewski, Martin (CPSO#: 71320)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1997

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 25 Jun 1999

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Polish

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1997

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
520 University Avenue West
Unit 203
Waterloo ON  N2T 2Z6
Phone: (519) 743-3641
Fax: (519) 743-1042
Electoral District: 03
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Martin Gajewski Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 08 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Gajewski ( CPSO# 71320 )

Business Address:
203 - 520 University Avenue West
Waterloo ON  N2T 2Z6
Phone Number: (519) 743-3641

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 17 Jun 1999 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MARTIN GAJEWSKI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GAJEWSKI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1997
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Jun 1999