Find A Doctor will be undergoing maintenance between 6:00pm on Friday, December 15, 2017 and 12:00 noon on Saturday, December 16, 2017. You may experience intermittent service interruptions during this time. We apologize for the inconvenience.

×Close

Galanis, Eleni Anna (CPSO#: 69052)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Aug 2003

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Aug 2003

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French, Greek, Spanish

Education:University of Sherbrooke, 1995

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Community Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2000 RCPSC Specialist

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
PostGrad Yr 1 - Community Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 2 - Community Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 3 - Community Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 4 - Community Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 5 - Community Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1995
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 08 Jul 1997
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Aug 2003