Galante, Gary Joshua (CPSO#: 94612)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 30 May 2015

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 30 May 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:University of Alberta, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 30 Jun 2013 RCPSC Specialist
Gastroenterology Effective: 27 Oct 2016 RCPSC Specialist

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 15 Nov 2010 to 12 Dec 2010
Elective Trainee - Paediatric Cardiology

University of Toronto, 04 May 2015 to 30 May 2015
Elective Trainee - Paediatric Gastroenterology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Nov 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 12 Dec 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 04 May 2015
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 May 2015