Galante, Sean Marc (CPSO#: 98914)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2012

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 29 May 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Alberta, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Lakeridge Radiology
1 Hospital Court
Oshawa ON  L1G 2B9
Phone: (905) 576-8711 Ext. 4305
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Levine Myers Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 04 2005

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Rastogi ( CPSO# 68153 )
Dr. A. Myers ( CPSO# 61041 )
Dr. V. Massaad ( CPSO# 75329 )
Dr. R. Levine ( CPSO# 78178 )
Dr. G. Lacey ( CPSO# 67159 )
Dr. M. Khan ( CPSO# 81024 )
Dr. N. Isaac ( CPSO# 71092 )
Dr. G. Dotsikas ( CPSO# 66718 )
Dr. G. Donsky ( CPSO# 73822 )
Dr. M. Asch ( CPSO# 52679 )
Dr. W. Wei ( CPSO# 86891 )
Dr. A. Raikhlin ( CPSO# 86803 )
Dr. S. Galante ( CPSO# 98914 )

Business Address:
Baywood X-Ray & Ultrasound
Baywood Medical Clinic
101 - 95 Bayly Avenue
Ajax ON  L1S 7K8
Phone Number: (905) 428-0444

Business Address:
Lakeridge Health Oshawa Site
1 Hospital Court
Oshawa ON  L1G 2B9
Phone Number: (905) 576-8711

Business Address:
King Street X-Ray & Ultrasound
1290 Keith Ross Court
Oshawa ON  L1H 7K4
Phone Number: (905) 721-7702

Business Address:
Bowmanville X-Ray & Ultrasound
1101 - 222 King Street East
Bowmanville ON  L1C 1P6
Phone Number: (905) 623-2727


Corporation Name: Sean M. Galante Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 25 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Galante ( CPSO# 98914 )

Business Address:
Lakeridge Radiology
1 Hospital Court
Oshawa ON  L1G 2B9
Phone Number: (905) 576-8711

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Lakeridge Health,Clarington Site Bowmanville
Lakeridge Health,Oshawa General Site Oshawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective: 30 Jun 2012 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SEAN MARC GALANTE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GALANTE is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
Clinical Fellow - Diagnostic Radiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2012
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 May 2013