Galanter, Elizabeth (CPSO#: 61908)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2017

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2017

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, German, Polish, Russian

Education:Academy of Medicine, Gdansk, 1970

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Instructions: As of September 1, 2016, patients looking to obtain a copy of thier medical record may contact Record Storage by email at: recordsmedical4@gmail.com, or by telephone: 647-222-5888.
Date Received: 29 Aug 2016

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 05 Jun 1989 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 13 Feb 1990
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2017

Concerns

Source: Member
Active Date: October 3, 2017
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Summary of the Undertaking given by Dr. Elizabeth Galanter to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, effective October 3, 2017:

Dr. Galanter was the subject of College investigations into whether she engaged in professional misconduct and/or is incompetent in her general medicine practice. In the face of these allegations, Dr. Galanter, whose certificate of registration has expired, has agreed never to apply or reapply for registration as a physician in Ontario or any other jurisdiction.
Download Full Document (PDF)


Source: ICR Committee
Active Date: October 3, 2017
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Caution-in-Person:

A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee in which the disposition includes a "caution-in-person" is required by the College by-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed. A “caution-in-person” disposition requires the physician to attend at the College and be verbally cautioned by a panel of the Committee. The summary will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. Note that this requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015 or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015.

See PDF for the summary of a decision made against this member in which the disposition includes a caution-in-person.
Download Full Document (PDF)


Source: ICR Committee
Active Date: October 3, 2017
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Caution-in-Person:

A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee in which the disposition includes a "caution-in-person" is required by the College by-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed. A “caution-in-person” disposition requires the physician to attend at the College and be verbally cautioned by a panel of the Committee. The summary will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. Note that this requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015 or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015.

See PDF for the summary of a decision made against this member in which the disposition includes a caution-in-person.
Download Full Document (PDF)