Galbraith, Elizabeth Catherine (CPSO#: 26462)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2013

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of St. Andrews, 1969

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Instructions: Requests for records should be directed to Dr. M. Imbulgoda's office at 905-689-8242
Date Received: 11 Feb 2014

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1969
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Jul 1971
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 31 May 1974
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2013