Find A Doctor will be undergoing maintenance between 6:00pm on Friday, December 15, 2017 and 12:00 noon on Saturday, December 16, 2017. You may experience intermittent service interruptions during this time. We apologize for the inconvenience.

×Close

Galema, Chris John (CPSO#: 65423)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1992

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 09 Jul 1993

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 1992

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Unit 307
1950 Algonquin Avenue
North Bay ON  P1B 4Z2
Phone: (705) 840-5351
Electoral District: 08
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Chris Galema Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 16 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. C. Galema ( CPSO# 65423 )

Business Address:
307 - 1950 Algonquin Avenue
North Bay ON  P1B 4Z2
Phone Number: (705) 840-5351

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
North Bay Regional Health Centre North Bay

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. CHRIS JOHN GALEMA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GALEMA is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Other - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1992
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 09 Jul 1993