Galenzoski, Kerry Jane (CPSO#: 78843)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 22 Apr 2006

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 22 Apr 2006

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:The University of Manitoba, 1998

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 24 Apr 2006 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 10 Feb 2003 to 09 Feb 2004
PostGrad Yr 2 - Psychiatry

University of Ottawa, 10 Feb 2004 to 03 Mar 2004
PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry

University of Ottawa, 04 Mar 2004 to 09 Feb 2005
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry

University of Ottawa, 10 Feb 2005 to 09 Feb 2006
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry

University of Ottawa, 10 Feb 2006 to 22 Apr 2006
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 10 Feb 2003
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 22 Apr 2006