Galessiere, Paul Frank (CPSO#: 58257)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 02 Aug 2016

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 02 Aug 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Italian

Education:University of Toronto, 1987

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Manitoba

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 10 Nov 1993 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1987
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Jul 1988
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 02 Aug 2016