Galicia, Elaine Zapata (CPSO#: 81759)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 31 Jul 2006

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 31 Jul 2006

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:University of The East Philippines, 1988

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Aug 2004 to 08 Oct 2004
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Neurology

University of Toronto, 09 Oct 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Neurology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Neurology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 31 Jul 2006
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Neurology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Aug 2004
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 09 Oct 2004
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Jul 2006