Galiwango, Joseph (CPSO#: 27752)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 May 2011

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 May 2011

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Bristol, 1972

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Instructions: Patients looking to obtain a copy of their medical record may contact: Tel: (519) 968-3434
Date Received: 12 Jul 2011

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 14 Nov 1977 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 10 Dec 1973
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Aug 1975
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 May 2011