Galko, Barbara Mary (CPSO#: 50611)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 15 Jul 1996

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 15 Jul 1996

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French, Hungarian

Education:McGill University, 1980

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 21 Nov 1984 RCPSC Specialist
Respirology Effective: 21 Nov 1985 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 16 Jun 1980
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 11 Nov 1983
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 15 Jul 1996