Gall, James Murray (CPSO#: 26677)

Current Status: Active Member as of 03 Feb 1981

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 03 Feb 1981

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1973

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Jim Gall Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Jun 14 2016

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jul 1975 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JAMES MURRAY GALL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GALL is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 13 Jun 1973
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 04 Jul 1974
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 11 Sep 1978
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 03 Feb 1981