Gallagher, Bridget (CPSO#: 51646)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2014

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Dublin, 1975

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: P O Box 732 39 Queen Street Cobourg. ON K9A 4R5
Date Received: 28 Apr 2014

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 24 Nov 1983 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 02 Jul 1981
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Dec 1983
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2014