Gallagher, John Anthony (CPSO#: 78832)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 31 Jul 2004

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 31 Jul 2004

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:University of Queensland, 1993

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Feb 2003 to 28 Feb 2003
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Orthopedic Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Mar 2003 to 31 Jan 2004
Clinical Fellow - Orthopedic Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Feb 2004 to 01 Sep 2004
Clinical Fellow - Orthopedic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Feb 2003
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Mar 2003
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Jul 2004