Gallagher, Julie Anne (CPSO#: 65482)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1992

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 09 Jul 1993

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1992

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
119 Memorial Ave.
Suite 103
Orillia ON  L3V 5X1
Phone: (705) 326-3549
Fax: (705) 326-9529
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: J. Gallagher Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 12 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Gallagher ( CPSO# 65482 )

Business Address:
119 Memorial Avenue
Suite 103
Orillia ON  L3V 5X1
Phone Number: (705) 326-3549

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Orillia Soldiers Memorial Hospital Orillia

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jun 1994 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JULIE ANNE GALLAGHER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GALLAGHER is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Other - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1992
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 09 Jul 1993