Gallagher, Patrick Francis (CPSO#: 50612)

Current Status: Revoked: Discipline Committee as of 14 Jun 2011

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 14 Jun 2011

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1982

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 14 Jun 1982
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Feb 1984
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 09 May 2008
Revoked: Discipline Committee. Effective: 14 Jun 2011

Previous Discipline Hearings

Committee: Discipline
Decision Date: 14 Jun 2011
Summary:

 On June 14, 2011, the Discipline Committee found that Dr. Patrick Francis Gallagher committed an 
 act of professional misconduct, in that he sexually abused patients, and in that he has been found 
 guilty of an offence that is relevant to his suitability to practise. 
On April 4, 2011, Dr. 
 Gallagher pleaded guilty to, and was convicted of, four counts of sexual assault, contrary to 
 section 271 of the Criminal Code (Patients E, F, G and C).
On June 14, 2011, Dr. Gallagher 
 admitted that he has been found guilty of an offence relevant to his suitability to practise and 
 that he sexually abused these four patients: he engaged in sexual intercourse with Patients F and 
 C; initiated genitaltogenital contact with Patient E; inserted his fingers into Patient G's vagina 
 and moved them in and out in what the patient described as an intercourse movement; and, engaged 
 in touching of a sexual nature with Patients C, E, F, and G. 
The Discipline Committee ordered and 
 directed that:

1.	The Registrar revoke Dr. Gallagher's certificate of registration, such 
 revocation to take effect immediately. 

2.	Dr. Gallagher attend before the panel to be 
 reprimanded. 

3.	Dr. Gallagher shall within 30 days pay the College its costs of this proceeding 
 in the amount of $3,650.

4.	The results of this proceeding be included in the register.

Decision: Download Full Decision (PDF)
Appeal: No Appeal
Hearing Date(s): June 14, 2011