Gallant, Catherine Angela (CPSO#: 62609)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1992

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 1997

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Memorial University of Newfoundland, 1990

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Ottawa Hospital
General Campus
501 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L6
Phone: (613) 737-8187
Fax: (613) 737-8189
Electoral District: 07
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Ottawa Gastrointestinal Institute
1910 St. Laurent Blvd, Unit 29
Ottawa, ON
Ottawa ON  K1G 1A4
Canada
Phone: (613) 686-6656
County: Regional Municipality of Ottawa-Carleton
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Catherine Gallant Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 14 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. C. Gallant ( CPSO# 62609 )

Business Address:
Ottawa Hospital
General Campus
501 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L6
Phone Number: (613) 737-8187

Business Address:
1053 Carling Avenue
Ottawa ON  K1Y 4E9
Phone Number: (613) 722-7000

Business Address:
1967 Riverside Drive
Ottawa ON  K1H 7W9
Phone Number: (613) 798-5555

Business Address:
1910 St. Laurent Boulevard
Suite 29
Ottawa ON  K1G 1A4
Phone Number: (613) 686-6656

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Ottawa Hospital,Civic Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital,General Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital,Riverside Site Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 30 Jun 1996 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. CATHERINE ANGELA GALLANT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GALLANT is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 1 - Anesthesiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Resident 2 - Anesthesiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 3 - Anesthesiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 4 - Anesthesiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1990
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 14 Jun 1991
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1992
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 1997