Gallant, Lee Ann (CPSO#: 50614)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1981

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 31 Jul 1986

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Hebrew, Italian

Education:Tel Aviv University, 1980

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
2797 Bathurst Street
Suite 302
Toronto ON  M6B 4B9
Phone: (416) 789-4376
Fax: (416) 789-5321
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Gallant Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Apr 10 2009


Corporation Name: Gallant Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 06 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. L. Gallant ( CPSO# 50614 )
Dr. T. Gallant ( CPSO# 50615 )

Business Address:
302 - 2797 Bathurst Street
Toronto ON  M6B 4B9
Phone Number: (416) 789-4376

Business Address:
1262 Don Mills Road
Suite 207
Toronto ON  M3B 2W7
Phone Number: (416) 741-7412

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hospital For Sick Children Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 19 Jun 1986 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. LEE ANN GALLANT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GALLANT is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1981
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 31 Jul 1986