Gallant, Michel (CPSO#: 78609)

Current Status: Active Member as of 31 Jul 2008

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 31 Jul 2008

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Sherbrooke, 2000

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
343 Preston Street
Suite 200
Ottawa ON  K1S 1N4
Phone: (613) 729-1616
Fax: (613) 729-3838
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Michel Gallant Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 09 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Gallant ( CPSO# 78609 )

Business Address:
200 - 343 Preston Street
Ottawa ON  K1S 1N4
Phone Number: (613) 729-1616

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Montfort Hospital Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Plastic Surgery Effective: 14 May 2008 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MICHEL GALLANT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GALLANT is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Oct 2002 to 31 Dec 2002
Elective Trainee - Plastic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 03 Oct 2002
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Dec 2002
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 31 Jul 2008