Gallant, Tania Marie (CPSO#: 79143)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 30 Jun 2008

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 30 Jun 2008

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:Dalhousie University, 2003

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2007 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 4 - Endocrinology and Metabolism

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 5 - Endocrinology and Metabolism

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2003
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2008