Gallant, Tsvi (CPSO#: 50615)

Current Status: Active Member as of 29 Jun 1990

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 29 Jun 1990

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Hebrew, Italian, Spanish

Education:Tel Aviv University, 1981

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 207
1262 Don Mills Road
Toronto ON  M3B 2W7
Phone: (416) 741-7412
Fax: (416) 741-9131
Electoral District: 10
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

307- 1262 Don Mills Rd.
Toronto ON  M6B 2W7
Canada
Fax: 416 7419131
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Gallant Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Apr 10 2009


Corporation Name: Gallant Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 06 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. L. Gallant ( CPSO# 50614 )
Dr. T. Gallant ( CPSO# 50615 )

Business Address:
302 - 2797 Bathurst Street
Toronto ON  M6B 4B9
Phone Number: (416) 789-4376

Medical Records Location

Instructions: Patients should fax their medical record requests to Dr. Gallant at: 416-741-9131.
Date Received: 14 Feb 2018

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. TSVI GALLANT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GALLANT is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1981
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1988
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 03 Apr 1990
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 23 Apr 1990
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Jun 1990