Gallay, Stephen Howard (CPSO#: 61131)

Current Status: Active Member as of 12 Jun 1989

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 12 Jul 1990

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French, Portuguese

Education:McGill University, 1989

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
601 Harwood Avenue South
Suite 200
Ajax ON  L1S 2J5
Phone: (905) 426-3098
Fax: (905) 426-6667
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Stephen Gallay Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 05 2003

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Gallay ( CPSO# 61131 )

Business Address:
200 - 601 Harwood Avenue South
Ajax ON  L1S 2J5
Phone Number: (905) 426-3098

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Lakeridge Health,Ajax and Pickering Site Ajax
Rouge Valley Centenary Health Centre,Toronto Toronto
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Orthopedic Surgery Effective: 11 Sep 1996 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. STEPHEN HOWARD GALLAY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GALLAY is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 1 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 2 - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 2 - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Resident 3 - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 4 - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 4 - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
Clinical Fellow - Orthopedic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 12 Jun 1989
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 12 Jul 1990