Gallie, Brenda Louise (CPSO#: 28022)

Current Status: Active Member as of 22 Jan 1976

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 22 Jan 1976

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, German

Education:Queen's University, 1969

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Hospital for Sick Children
Department of Ophthalmology
555 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 1X8
Phone: (416) 813-5868
Electoral District: 10
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

University Health Network
Princess Margaret Cancer Centre
610 University Ave
Toronto Ontario
Toronto ON  M5G 2M9
Canada
Phone: (416) 294-9729
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Jewett Gallie Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 26 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Jewett ( CPSO# 22988 )
Dr. B. Gallie ( CPSO# 28022 )

Business Address:
Princess Margaret Hospital
3-130 - 610 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 2M9
Phone Number: (416) 946-2909


Corporation Name: Brenda Gallie Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 23 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. B. Gallie ( CPSO# 28022 )

Business Address:
Hospital for Sick Children
Department of Opthalmology
555 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 1X8
Phone Number: (416) 294-9729

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Alberta

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hospital For Sick Children Toronto
University Health Network,Princess Margaret Hospital-Ontario Cancer Institute Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Ophthalmology Effective: 05 Apr 1976 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. BRENDA LOUISE GALLIE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GALLIE is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 17 Jul 1969
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 27 May 1974
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Jun 1976