Galloway, Elizabeth Anne (CPSO#: 24689)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 13 Jul 2005

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 13 Jul 2005

Summary

Former Name: Galloway, Elizabeth Anne Galloway (used until: 21 Oct 1987 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1971

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 09 Nov 1976 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 12 Jun 1971
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Jun 1972
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 13 Jul 2005