Galloway, Victoria Ann (CPSO#: 77926)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2002

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 22 Dec 2005

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2002

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Waterview Medical and Chiropractic
Centre
464 Locust Street
Burlington ON  L7S 1V1
Phone: (289) 245-1071
Fax: (289) 245-1486
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Victoria Galloway Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 08 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. V. Galloway ( CPSO# 77926 )

Business Address:
464 Locust Street
Burlington ON  L7S 1V1
Phone Number: (289) 245-1071

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 16 Dec 2005 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. VICTORIA ANN GALLOWAY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GALLOWAY is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 1 - Community Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 2 - Community Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 2 - Community Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 31 Dec 2005
PostGrad Yr 2 - Community Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2002
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Dec 2005