Galpern, Wendy Rachel (CPSO#: 77377)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 30 Jun 2005

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 30 Jun 2005

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:University of Massachusetts, 1998

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 06 Apr 2002 to 10 May 2002
Elective Trainee - Neurology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
Clinical Fellow - Neurology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
Clinical Fellow - Neurology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 06 Apr 2002
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 10 May 2002
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 02 Sep 2003
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2005