Galpin, Robert Donald (CPSO#: 30605)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2001

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2001

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1977

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Orthopedic Surgery Effective: 22 Nov 1982 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 20 Jun 1977
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Feb 1979
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 15 Apr 1983
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 31 Jul 1987
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2001