Galvin, Catherine Patricia (CPSO#: 66842)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 13 Sep 2001

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 13 Sep 2001

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 1993

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 10 Jun 1996 CFPC Specialist

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
PostGrad Yr 1 - Anesthesiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1994 to 31 Dec 1994
Resident 1 - Anesthesiology

McMaster University, 01 Jan 1995 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Sep 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1993
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Jun 1996
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 13 Sep 2001