Gamble, David Gregory (CPSO#: 72399)

Current Status: Active Member as of 02 Oct 1998

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 02 Oct 1998

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McGill University, 1993

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 101
1205 Amber Drive
Thunder Bay ON  P7B 6M4
Phone: (807) 622-3848
Fax: (807) 622-4268
Electoral District: 09
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: David Gregory Gamble Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 28 2003

Shareholders:
Dr. D. Gamble ( CPSO# 72399 )

Business Address:
101 - 1205 Amber Drive
Thunder Bay ON  P7B 6M4
Phone Number: (807) 622-3848

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Atikokan General Hospital Atikokan
Dryden Regional Health Centre Dryden
Geraldton District Hospital Geraldton
La Verendrye Hospital,Riverside Health Care Facilities Fort Frances
Lake of the Woods District Hospital Kenora
Manitouwadge General Hospital Manitouwadge
McCausland Hospital Terrace Bay
Nipigon District Memorial Hospital Nipigon
Rainy River Site-Riverside Health Care Facilities Rainy River
Red Lake Margaret Cochenour Memorial Hospital Red Lake
Sioux Lookout,Meno-Ya-Win Health Centre Sioux Lookout
Thunder Bay Regional Health Sciences Centre Thunder Bay
Wilson Memorial General Hospital Marathon

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 15 Jun 1998 RCPSC Specialist
Infectious Diseases Effective: 09 Sep 1999 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. DAVID GREGORY GAMBLE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GAMBLE is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 02 Jul 1998 to 31 Jul 1998
Elective Trainee - Paediatric Infectious Diseases

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 02 Jul 1998
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Jul 1998
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 02 Oct 1998