Gamble, James Brian (CPSO#: 21480)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 02 Jun 2015

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 02 Jun 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1967

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Brian Gamble Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Nov 6 2015

Medical Records Location

Instructions: Patients looking to obtain a copy of their medical records may contact Ms. Cheryl Crow at (519) 354-5540.
Date Received: 26 Jul 2013

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jul 1977 CFPC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 05 Jul 1968
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 02 Jun 2015