Game, Melaku Mengistu (CPSO#: 74388)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 31 Oct 2001

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 31 Oct 2001

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:Karl Marx University of Leipzig, 1991

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 18 Oct 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
Clinical Fellow - Hematology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
Clinical Fellow - Hematology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2001 to 31 Oct 2001
Clinical Fellow - Hematology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Nov 1999
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Oct 2001