Gamliel, Ziv (CPSO#: 58276)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2017

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2017

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Hebrew

Education:University of Toronto, 1987

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

USA - Maryland

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 05 Nov 1995 RCPSC Specialist
Thoracic Surgery Effective: 04 Sep 1997 RCPSC Specialist

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 1 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 2 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 3 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 3 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 4 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Resident 5 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 31 Dec 1995
Clinical Fellow - Thoracic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 1996 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 6 - Thoracic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 31 Dec 1996
Resident 6 - Thoracic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 1997 to 30 Jun 1997
Resident 7 - Thoracic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Sep 1997
Clinical Fellow - Thoracic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1987
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 03 Oct 1988
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2017