Find A Doctor will be undergoing maintenance between 6:00pm on Friday, December 15, 2017 and 12:00 noon on Saturday, December 16, 2017. You may experience intermittent service interruptions during this time. We apologize for the inconvenience.

×Close

Gammal, Nadia Therese (CPSO#: 70207)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1996

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 27 Jun 2002

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1996

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Department of Radiology
265 Dundas Street East
Belleville ON  K8N 5A9
Phone: (613) 969-5511
Fax: (613) 969-5561
Electoral District: 06
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Lennox and Addington County General
Hospital
8 Richmond Park Drive
Napanee ON  K7R 2Z4
Canada
Phone: 613-354-3301
County: County of Lennox and Addington
Electoral District: 06

115 Barrack street
Kingston ON
Kingston ON  K7K 1G2
Canada
Phone: 613-549-1440
County: County of Frontenac
Electoral District: 06
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Nadia Gammal Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 04 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Montalvo ( CPSO# 71490 )
Dr. N. Gammal ( CPSO# 70207 )

Business Address:
Department of Radiology
265 Dundas Street East
Belleville ON  K8N 5A9
Phone Number: (613) 969-5511

Business Address:
8 Richmond Park Drive
Napanee ON  K7R 2Z7
Phone Number: (613) 354-3301

Business Address:
115 Barrack Street
Kingston ON  K7K 1G2
Phone Number: (613) 549-1440

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective: 28 May 2002 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. NADIA THERESE GAMMAL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GAMMAL is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 2 - Diagnostic Radiology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 3 - Diagnostic Radiology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 4 - Diagnostic Radiology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 5 - Diagnostic Radiology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
Clinical Fellow - Diagnostic Radiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1996
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Jun 2002