Gammon, Braden Montgomery (CPSO#: 84657)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2006

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2011

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
The Ottawa Hospital
Civic Campus
J159
1053 Carling Avenue
Ottawa ON  K1Y 4E9
Phone: (613) 798-5555 Ext. 13263
Fax: (613) 761-4374
Electoral District: 07

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Ottawa Hospital,Civic Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital,General Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital,Riverside Site Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Orthopedic Surgery Effective: 30 Jun 2011 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. BRADEN MONTGOMERY GAMMON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GAMMON is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 1 - Orthopedic Surgery

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - Orthopedic Surgery

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 3 - Orthopedic Surgery

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 4 - Orthopedic Surgery

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 5 - Orthopedic Surgery

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
Clinical Fellow - Orthopedic Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
Clinical Fellow - Orthopedic Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Aug 2013 to 20 Dec 2013
Clinical Fellow - Orthopedic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2006
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2011