Gammon, Jessica Rae (CPSO#: 84714)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2006

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2010

Summary

Former Name: Tomlinson, Jessica Rae (used until: 03 Jul 2006 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Capital KidZ Medical Centre
737 Silver Seven Road
Unit 5
Ottawa ON  K2V 0H3
Phone: (613) 828-3122
Fax: (613) 828-2010
Electoral District: 07

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Queensway Carleton Hospital Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 30 Jun 2010 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JESSICA RAE GAMMON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GAMMON is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 1 - Pediatrics

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - Pediatrics

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 3 - Pediatrics

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 4 - Pediatrics

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2006
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2010