Gamulka, Beth Deborah (CPSO#: 66919)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1993

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 1997

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French, Hebrew

Education:McGill University, 1993

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
The Hospital for Sick Children
555 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 1X8
Phone: (416) 813-7500
Electoral District: 10
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Michael Garron Hospital
852 Coxwell Avenue
East York ON  M4C 3E7
Canada
Phone: (416) 461 8272
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

4001 Leslie Street
North York ON  M2K 1E1
Canada
Phone: 416 7566000
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

491 Eglinton Avenue W
Toronto ON  M5N 1A8
Canada
Phone: 4168606696
Fax: 4168488850
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Beth Gamulka Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 01 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. B. Gamulka ( CPSO# 66919 )

Business Address:
The Hospital for Sick Children
Division of Pediatric Medicine
555 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 1X8
Phone Number: (416) 813-7500

Business Address:
491 Eglinton Avenue West
Suite 301
Toronto ON  M5N 1A8
Phone Number: (416) 850-6696

Business Address:
North York General Hospital
4001 Leslie Street
North York ON  M2K 1E1
Phone Number: (416) 756-6000

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hospital For Sick Children Toronto
Scarborough Hospital,General Site Toronto
Scarborough Hospital-Birchmount Campus Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 30 Jun 1997 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. BETH DEBORAH GAMULKA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GAMULKA is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
PostGrad Yr 1 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 2 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 3 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
Resident 4 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
Clinical Fellow - Pediatrics

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1993
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 1997