Gan, Shien Wen Sheryl (CPSO#: 107710)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 30 Sep 2016

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 30 Sep 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:University of Glasgow, 2005

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Singapore
United Kingdom

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Aug 2015 to 19 Oct 2015
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Nephrology

University of Toronto, 20 Oct 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
Clinical Fellow - Nephrology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Sep 2016
Clinical Fellow - Nephrology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Aug 2015
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 20 Oct 2015
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Sep 2016