Gan-Gaisano, Margaret Coquinco (CPSO#: 63318)

Current Status: Active Member as of 18 Jan 1991

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 18 Jan 1991

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: Chinese, English, Fukien, Mandarin, Tagalog

Education:University of the Philippines, 1981

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 315
2863 Ellesmere Road
Scarborough ON  M1E 5E9
Phone: (416) 724-8290
Fax: (416) 724-1985
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Herbert Y. Gaisano Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 19 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. G. Gaisano ( CPSO# 100966)
Dr. M. Gan-Gaisano ( CPSO# 63318 )
Dr. H. Gaisano ( CPSO# 63315 )

Business Address:
Toronto Western Hospital
399 Bathurst Street
Suite 8MP-327
Toronto ON  M5T 2S8
Phone Number: (416) 603-5949

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Rouge Valley Centenary Health Centre,Toronto Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 22 Nov 1990 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MARGARET COQUINCO GAN-GAISANO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GAN-GAISANO is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Clinical Fellow - Pediatrics

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Jan 1991