Ganame, Javier Ignacio (CPSO#: 85663)

Current Status: Active Member as of 11 Jan 2010

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 11 Jan 2010

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Spanish

Education:Universidad Catolica de Cordoba, 1995

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
St Josephs Hospital
Fontbonne Building
Room F506 2
50 Charlton Avenue
Hamilton ON  L8N 4A6
Phone: (905) 522-1155 Ext. 32800
Fax: (905) 521-6068
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Javier Ganame Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 03 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Ganame ( CPSO# 85663 )

Business Address:
St. Joseph's Hospital
Room F506 2 - Fontbonne Building
50 Charlton Avenue East
Hamilton ON  L8N 4A6
Phone Number: (905) 522-1155

Business Address:
1200 Main Street West
Room 3U5
Hamilton ON  L8S 4K1
Phone Number: (905) 521-2100

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster & Childrens Hosp,McMaster & Children's Hospital Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences,General Site Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences,Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre Hamilton
St Joseph's Healthcare System,Hamilton Hamilton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Cardiology Effective: 11 Jan 2010 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Oct 2006 to 20 Dec 2006
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Cardiology

McMaster University, 21 Dec 2006 to 31 Mar 2007
Clinical Fellow - Cardiology

University of Toronto, 01 May 2011 to 31 Jul 2011
Clinical Fellow - Cardiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 03 Oct 2006
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 22 Dec 2006
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Mar 2007
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 11 Jan 2010
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 30 Jun 2013
Terms and conditions amended by Effective: 30 Jun 2013
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 01 Jul 2015
Terms and conditions amended by Effective: 30 Jun 2016
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. Effective: 01 Jul 2015

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
Registration Committee Effective: 01 Jul 2015 Active View Details [+]
            1.    Dr. Javier Ignacio Ganame may practise medicine only:

                  (i)   in a setting that is approved by the Chair, Department of Medicine,
                        Division  of  Cardiology,  McMaster University, in which Dr. Ganame
                        holds an academic appointment  at  the rank of Associate Professor,
                        and
                  
                  (ii)  in accordance with the requirements of his appointment.
                  
            2.    The certificate of registration automatically  expires when Dr. Ganame no
                  longer holds the appointment referred to in clause 1.