Ganapathy, Gobi Ratnaswami (CPSO#: 63031)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2016

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2016

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: Ganapathy, Gobichettipalayam Ratnaswami (used until: 19 Oct 1994 )

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Hindi, Tamil

Education:Sambalpur University, 1966

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: RSRS, 111 St. Regis Crescent South, Toronto, ON, M3J 1Y6, 1-(888)-563-3732
Date Received: 17 May 2016


Address: Record Storage and Retrieval Services Inc 111 Regis Street South Toronto, ON M3J 1Y6 Tel: 1 888 563 3732 Ext. 1
Date Received: 31 Aug 2015

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Neurology Effective: 30 Jun 1998 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 1 - Neurology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 3 - Neurology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 4 - Neurology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Clinical Fellow - Neurology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1994 to 31 Dec 1994
Clinical Fellow - Neurology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jan 1995 to 30 Jun 1995
Clinical Fellow - Neurology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Clinical Fellow - Neurology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Sep 1996
Clinical Fellow - Neurology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Oct 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
Clinical Fellow - Neurology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
Resident 5 - Neurology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 14 Aug 1990
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1998
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 11 Aug 1998
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2016

Previous Hearings

Committee: Discipline
Decision Date: 13 Feb 2009
Summary:

 On February 13, 2009, the Discipline Committee found that Dr. Ganapathy committed an act of 
 professional misconduct, in that he has been found guilty of an offence that is relevant to his 
 suitability to practice, under clause 51(1)(a) of the Health Professions Procedural Code ("the 
 Code") which is Schedule 2 to the Regulated Health Professions Act, 1991.

Dr. Ganapathy, a 
 neurologist, saw Ms. X, a patient, on two occasions in 2001. At one of these consultations, Dr. 
 Ganapathy hugged Ms. X. In March 2002, Dr. Ganapathy was charged by the Ontario Provincial Police 
 with sexual assault contrary to the Criminal Code relating to this incident. In April 2003, Dr. 
 Ganapathy pleaded guilty to common assault contrary to s. 266 of the Criminal Code. The Crown did 
 not proceed with the sexual assault charge. Dr. Ganapathy was granted a conditional discharge, 
 fined a victim fine surcharge, and was given twelve months probation. Dr. Ganapathy brought this 
 matter to the attention of the College on his 2004 CPSO Annual Renewal form.

On January 6, 2010, 
 the Discipline Committee ordered and directed that:

1.	Dr. Ganapathy shall appear before the 
 panel to be reprimanded.
2.	Dr. Ganapathy shall pay costs to the College in the amount of $7,300.

Decision: Download Full Decision (PDF)
Appeal: No Appeal
Hearing Date(s): Aug 18, 2008