Ganapathy, Sugantha (CPSO#: 62963)

Current Status: Active Member as of 03 Aug 1990

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 21 Jan 1993

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Tamil

Education:University of Madras, 1973

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
London Health Sciences Centre
339 Windermere Road
London ON  N6A 5A5
Phone: (519) 685-8500 Ext. 35115
Fax: (519) 663-3279
Electoral District: 02
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

St Joseph's Health Care
268 Grosvenor Street
London ON  N6A 4V2
Canada
Phone: (519) 646-6000
Fax: (519) 646-6116
County: County of Middlesex
Electoral District: 02

London scoping Centre Ltd
310 Wellington Road south
London ON  N6C4P4
Canada
Phone: 5194334700
Fax: 519 433 4702
County: County of Middlesex
Electoral District: 02
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Ganapathy Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 08 2005

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Ganapathy ( CPSO# 62963 )

Business Address:
310 Wellington Road South
London ON  N6C 4P4
Phone Number: (529) 433-4700

Business Address:
339 Windermere Road
London ON  N6A 5A5
Phone Number: (519) 685-8500

Business Address:
268 Grosvenor Street
London ON  N6A 4V2
Phone Number: (519) 646-6000

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
London Health Sciences Centre,University Site London
St Joseph's Health Care-St Joseph's Site,London London

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 16 Nov 1992 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SUGANTHA GANAPATHY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GANAPATHY is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 03 Aug 1990
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Jan 1993