Ganapathy, Venkatanarayanan (CPSO#: 97514)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 31 Jul 2014

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 31 Jul 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Tamil Nadu Dr M G R Medical University, 1998

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Orthopedic Surgery Effective: 30 Jun 2012 RCPSC Specialist

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 23 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
Clinical Fellow - Orthopedic Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jul 2013
Clinical Fellow - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Aug 2013 to 31 Jan 2014
Clinical Fellow - Orthopedic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 May 2012
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 31 Jul 2014