Gandell, Dov Ephraim (CPSO#: 77767)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2002

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2006

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:McGill University, 2002

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
Suite HG 69
2075 Bayview Avenue
Toronto ON  M4N 3M5
Phone: (416) 480-4076
Fax: (416) 480-4778
Electoral District: 10
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

10 Trench Street
Richmond Hill ON  L4C 4Z3
Canada
Phone: (905) 883-1212 Ext. 3895
Fax: (905) 883-2181
County: Regional Municipality of York
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Gandell Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 16 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. D. Gandell ( CPSO# 77767 )

Business Address:
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
Suite HG69
2075 Bayview Avenue
Toronto ON  M4N 3M5
Phone Number: (416) 480-4076

Business Address:
10 Trench Street
Richmond Hill ON  L4C 4Z3
Phone Number: (905) 883-1212

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2006 RCPSC Specialist
Geriatric Medicine Effective: 31 Oct 2011 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. DOV EPHRAIM GANDELL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GANDELL is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 4 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Sep 2009 to 31 Oct 2009
Clinical Fellow - Geriatric Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Nov 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 5 - Geriatric Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 5 - Geriatric Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2002
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2006