Gandhi, Harjeet Singh (CPSO#: 85616)

Current Status: Active Member as of 25 May 2010

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 25 May 2010

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Hindi, Panjabi/Punjabi, Urdu

Education:Guru Nanak Dev University, 1979

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Hamilton health sciences
McMaster unjversity medical centre
Hamilton
ON
Hamilton ON  L8M 1K7
Phone: 289 237 5322
Electoral District: 04

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster & Childrens Hosp,McMaster & Children's Hospital Hamilton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Orthopedic Surgery Effective: 01 Jun 2009 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. HARJEET SINGH GANDHI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GANDHI is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 20 Sep 2006
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 01 Jul 2007
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 23 Aug 2007
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 22 Aug 2008
Terms and conditions amended by Effective: 30 Jun 2009
Terms and conditions amended by Effective: 30 Jun 2010
Terms and conditions amended by Effective: 30 Jun 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 May 2010